THE INTERFAITH FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provides advocacy/advice/information on a variety of Interfaith topics by arranging small focused conferences that bring together experts in the relevant fields.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2007
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 March 1995: Standard registration
- 03 June 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.59k | £68.82k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.59k | £66.49k | £1.60k | £575 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 20 September 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 09 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 28 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 28 November 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 08 December 2004 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 08 December 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2 MARCH 1995
Charitable objects
(A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE STUDY AND DISSEMINATION OF ETHICAL PRINCIPLES INDICATED IN THE TEACHING OF THE THREE RELIGIONS OF CHRISTIANITY ISLAM AND JUDAISM AND (B) GENERALLY TO BENEFIT THE PUBLIC IN SUCH MANNER AS MAY BE CHARITABLE BY THE PROMOTION OF HIGH STANDARDS OF ETHICAL PRACTICE AND THE PROMOTION OF GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN THE PEOPLES OF DIFFERENT NATIONS AND OF DIFFERENT CULTURES AND FAITHS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window