DREAM MAKERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve people, particularly but not exclusively children, their families and carers, who have severe physical, mental or life threatening illnesses.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE TERESA MCKEOWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JUNE BLOSSOM MAVIS WALSH COOPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
THOMAS JOSEPH MCKEOWN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.84k | £5.47k | £26.20k | £45.90k | £87.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.70k | £5.96k | £18.79k | £18.91k | £53.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 March 2024 | 34 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 8TH MARCH 1995
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PEOPLE PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY CHILDREN THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS WHO HAVE SEVERE PHYSICAL OR MENTAL OR LIFE THREATENING DISEASES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
DREAM MAKERS
69 Meriden Road
Hampton-in-Arden
SOLIHULL
B92 0BS
- Phone:
- 01675 442555
- Email:
- DREAMMAKERS21@OUTLOOK.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window