GREENACRE COMMUNITY HALL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity exists to provide a space for local community groups and local people to utilise. The groups encourage social inclusion, such as the Rawdon Darby and Joan club, Karate, Yoga, Pilates, Rugbytots, Old time Dancing. NHS Blood donation Sessions are also held at the Community Hall on a regular basis
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Leeds City
Governance
- 22 March 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Kitching | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul John Spencer Wadsworth | Trustee | 12 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £56.05k | £71.94k | £39.49k | £34.82k | £60.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £52.08k | £55.12k | £55.96k | £55.82k | £46.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £31.85k | £8.15k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 06 September 2024 | 68 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 06 September 2024 | 68 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 04 December 2023 | 157 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 04 December 2023 | 157 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 19 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 19 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 23 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 23 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED AS AMENDED 21 OCTOBER 1994 AS AMENDED 30TH OCTOBER 1998 AND 16TH MAY 2005
Charitable objects
1.TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT. 2.TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
ELECTORAL AREA OF THE FORMER AIREBOROUGH U.D.C.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREEN ACRE HALL
NEW ROAD SIDE
RAWDON
LEEDS
LS19 6AS
- Phone:
- 01133910630
- Email:
- greenacrehall@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window