WEST OXFORD ANIMAL RESCUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We rescue and look after ill treated and injured animals. We also educate the general public in animal care
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
- Throughout London
Governance
- 23 March 1995: Standard registration
- WOAR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET FISHER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Samantha Louise fisher | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Harding | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £126.93k | £36.82k | £42.57k | £46.07k | £57.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.70k | £43.95k | £60.05k | £56.80k | £68.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 21 February 2025 | 54 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 21 February 2025 | 54 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 28 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 36 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 02 February 2023 | 36 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 13 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 30 December 2020 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 30 December 2020 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 MARCH 1995
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS WHO ARE SICK, ABANDONED, NEGLECTED OR ILL TREATED AND IN PARTICULAR TO PROVIDE OR MAINTAIN A RESCUE HOME OR OTHER FACILITIES FOR THE RECEPTION OR CARE OF UNWANTED ANIMALS AND THE TREATMENT OF SICK, ABANDONED, NEGLECTED OR ILL TREATED ANIMALS
Area of benefit
OXFORDSHIRE AND SURROUNDING COUNTIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 SWEETMANS ROAD
OXFORD
OX2 9BA
- Phone:
- 01865438128
- Email:
- woar@ntlworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window