HEALTH EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The development of health education for young people in the UK and support educational settings to create health promoting environments and to transform food culture within its setting and all stakeholders relating to the setting. HET continues to campaign in the areas of good food, access to free fresh drinking water and lobby with other national organisations to improve food services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 28 March 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Martin Joseph Caraher | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Elizabeth Weston | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm James Smith | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Rodney Wakefield | Trustee | 14 December 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.07k | £2.72k | £9.79k | £3.73k | £13.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.77k | £5.60k | £4.93k | £4.71k | £12.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £5.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 15 NOVEMBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN HEALTH EDUCATION PROGRAMMES INCLUDING THROUGH COURSES OF STUDY, RESEARCH AND SUPPORTING INDIVIDUALS AND GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
14A SHRUBLAND ROAD
LONDON
E8 4NN
- Phone:
- 02072548040
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window