Accounts and annual returns THE GEMINI RADIO CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1045212
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 31 January 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 31 January 2009 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2007 14 April 2008 74 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 14 April 2008 74 days late
Annual return 31 March 2006 31 January 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 31 January 2007 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 28 February 2006 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 28 February 2006 28 days late