Financial history ASSOCIATION OF ISLAMIC CHARITABLE PROJECTS

Charity number: 1045220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £666.57k £813.66k £656.92k £744.59k £0
Total expenditure £576.28k £481.36k £605.79k £692.14k £0
Income from government contracts £122.00k N/A £143.07k £144.69k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £284.47k £95.84k £1.50k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £376.01k £314.57k £228.47k £384.20k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £27.55k £10.62k £3.36k £3.07k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £124.36k £56.34k £254.42k £208.41k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £78.52k £93.44k £74.82k £61.44k N/A
Income - Other £60.14k £338.70k £95.84k £87.48k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £576.28k £481.36k £605.79k £692.14k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A