ASSOCIATION OF ISLAMIC CHARITABLE PROJECTS

Charity number: 1045220
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We have two principal aims: first, to educate people of all backgrounds about Islamic culture and morals, and second, to warn people against violent extremists that contradict these teachings and we continue to work towards the goal of a peaceful and productive society. Our organisation has a long history of fostering good relations with our non-Muslim neighbours.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 March 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr ASHRAF MALHAS Chair
ASSOCIATION OF ISLAMIC CHARITABLE PROJECTS
Received: On time
Bilal El Fares Trustee 20 January 2015
ASSOCIATION OF ISLAMIC CHARITABLE PROJECTS
Received: On time
HADI FAYED Trustee
ASSOCIATION OF ISLAMIC CHARITABLE PROJECTS
Received: On time
SHAHID RAUF Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £666.57k £813.66k £656.92k £744.59k £0
Total expenditure £576.28k £481.36k £605.79k £692.14k £0
Income from government contracts £122.00k N/A £143.07k £144.69k N/A
Income from government grants N/A £284.47k £95.84k £1.50k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £376.01k £314.57k £228.47k £384.20k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £27.55k £10.62k £3.36k £3.07k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £124.36k £56.34k £254.42k £208.41k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £78.52k £93.44k £74.82k £61.44k N/A
Income - Other £60.14k £338.70k £95.84k £87.48k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £576.28k £481.36k £605.79k £692.14k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 25 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
AICP Sunniyy Centre
FRANCIS STREET
HALIFAX
HX1 5JY
Phone:
01422255883