INTERNATIONAL HOUSE EDUCATIONAL TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 March 1995: Standard registration
- 23 November 2006: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 23 November 2006: Funds transferred to 270860 INTERNATIONAL HOUSE TRUST LIMITED
- INTERNATIONAL HOUSE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.15m | £5.22m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.85m | £4.84m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | 31 October 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | 31 October 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | 31 October 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | 31 October 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 17 AUGUST 1993 AS AMENDED ON 26 OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY PROMOTING AND PROVIDING FOR:- (I) THE TRAINING OF MEN AND WOMEN OF ANY NATIONALITY IN THE TEACHING OF FOREIGN LANGUAGES (INCLUDING THE TEACHING OF ENGLISH AS A FOREIGN LANGUAGE); (II) THE TEACHING OF FOREIGN LANGUAGES (INCLUDING THE TEACHING OF ENGLISH AS A FOREIGN LANGUAGE) TO MEN AND WOMEN OF ANY NATIONALITY; (III) THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE TEACHING OF FOREIGN LANGUAGES (INCLUDING THE TEACHING OF ENGLISH AS A FOREIGN LANGUAGE) IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY:- (A) THE ORGANISATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF TEACHER TRAINING IN RESPECT OF THE TEACHING OF FOREIGN LANGUAGES (INCLUDING THE TEACHING OF ENGLISH AS A FOREIGN LANGUAGE); (B) SPONSORING, ASSISTING AND ENCOURAGING THE ESTABLISHMENT OF LANGUAGE SCHOOLS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS (BUT IF OVERSEAS ORGANISED IN SUCH A WAY AS WOULD MAKE THEM EDUCATIONAL CHARITIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM); (C) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL SERVICES INTENDED TO CONTRIBUTE DIRECTLY AND INDIRECTLY TO THE IMPROVEMENT AND THE DEVELOPMENT OF THE TEACHING OF FOREIGN LANGUAGES (INCLUDING ENGLISH AS A FOREIGN LANGUAGE); (D) TEACHING OR PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE TEACHING OR PROVISION OF SKILLS RELEVANT TO THE ESTABLISHMENT AND ADMINISTRATION OF LANGUAGE SCHOOLS AND OF SCHOOLS FOR THE TRAINING OF TEACHERS OF FOREIGN LANGUAGES, BEING SKILLS INTENDED TO PROMOTE, PROVIDE OR CONTRIBUTE TO THE IMPROVEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF LANGUAGE TEACHING GENERALLY (INCLUDING THE TEACHING OF ENGLISH AS A FOREIGN LANGUAGE) WHETHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY; (E) COLLATING NATIONALLY OR INTERNATIONALLY WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS HAVING SIMILAR AIMS (BUT IF OVERSEAS ORGANISED IN SUCH A WAY AS TO MAKE THEM EDUCATIONAL CHARITIES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window