WIMBORNE ROUND TABLE NUMBER 548
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wimborne Round Table raises funds for local charities by two principal events, a charity golf day and the Wimborne Round Table Beer Festival. Proceeds from these events are then disbursed as grants to local charities as voted by a quorum of the club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Dorset
Governance
- 23 March 1995: Standard registration
- 09 December 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.15k | £5.11k | £4.27k | £5.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.80k | £3.60k | £5.14k | £3.97k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 09 March 2009 | 37 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2007 | 07 April 2008 | 67 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | 11 May 2007 | 100 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 7 MARCH 1995
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH ONE OR MORE CHARITABLE BODIES TRUSTS ASSOCIATIONS INSTITUTIONS OR ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS AFORESAID AND IN SUCH SHARES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE CLUB IN ORDINARY MEETING SHALL IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE OR SELECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window