Financial history GOTHAM PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity Number: 1045230
Charity reporting is overdue by 1207 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £13.48k £10.63k £9.72k £9.99k £10.26k
Total expenditure £15.06k £8.36k £11.98k £10.59k £6.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A