Trustees HINDU TEMPLE AND CULTURAL TRUST CENTRE, HOUNSLOW, MIDDLESEX
Charity number: 1045242

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Leela Devi Shori | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Manmohan Tewatia | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Neelam Chityal | Trustee | 24 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Asha Rani Sondhi | Trustee | 22 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ashwani Kumar | Trustee | 22 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
SAchdeva Sharan Lata | Trustee | 05 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Surinder Pal Sondhi | Trustee | 17 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Raj Kumar Tangri | Trustee | 17 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mr Prem Chand Sondhi | Trustee | 17 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Neena Mehta | Trustee | 17 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rajesh Kumar Nehra | Trustee | 17 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ram Kali Ghai | Trustee | 17 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sham Lal Dhir | Trustee | 17 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Swatantra Bala Kad | Trustee | 17 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Parmod Kumar Kad | Trustee | 27 May 2022 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.