Accounts and annual returns THE INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITY OF WOMEN LIVING WITH HIV AND AIDS

Charity number: 1045331
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2008 27 April 2009 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2008 27 April 2009 86 days late
Annual return 31 March 2007 29 January 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 29 January 2008 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2006 15 February 2007 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 31 January 2007 On Time