THE FORTUNE CENTRE OF RIDING THERAPY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The FCRT's mission is to enable horse-motivated students with special needs to relate more successfully to others and to have greater and more appropriate control over their own lives. This use of horses, to enable young people to learn and develop, is the core of our work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£3,713,256
Donations and legacies | £193.15k | |
Charitable activities | £3.47m | |
Other trading activities | £14.93k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £38.24k |
Total expenditure:
£3,467,403
Raising funds | £20.90k | |
Charitable activities | £3.45m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £3,505,174 from 35 government contract(s) and £39,287 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £20.90k | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.45m | |
Retained for future use | £245.85k |
People

63 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 March 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Estyn: Her Majesty's Inspectorate For Education And Training In Wales
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LORD MANNERS | Chair | 28 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
Ben Caufield-Lawrence | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Yarwood | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Francis Fernyhough | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|||||
Emma Louise Lane | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Richard Channell | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Ramsay | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Francis Vincent Hugh Neate | Trustee | 25 August 2022 |
|
|||||
DR KATE TREVELYAN THOMAS | Trustee | 13 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
CHARLES ANTHONY FOSTER | Trustee | 08 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Lady Swayne | Trustee | 24 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.78m | £2.33m | £2.61m | £3.37m | £3.71m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.75m | £2.34m | £2.74m | £3.08m | £3.47m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.47m | £2.14m | £2.46m | £3.01m | £3.51m | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.85k | £18.10k | £22.98k | £22.12k | £39.29k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £57.64k | £36.02k | £24.42k | £310.65k | £193.15k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £26.15k | £8.67k | £3.68k | £10.34k | £14.93k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.69m | £2.28m | £2.58m | £3.01m | £3.47m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £7.97k | £176 | £1 | £2 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £288 | £39.19k | £38.24k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £3.72k | £1.08k | £0 | £215.00k | £55.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.71m | £2.33m | £2.74m | £3.06m | £3.45m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £38.23k | £14.25k | £3.95k | £17.26k | £20.90k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £46.17k | £26.90k | £35.02k | £20.02k | £22.87k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £1.45k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.81m | £1.69m | £1.64m | £1.66m | £1.64m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £792.55k | £843.92k | £827.13k | £1.37m | £1.82m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £327.10k | £278.89k | £353.89k | £624.92k | £814.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 October 2024 | 108 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 October 2024 | 108 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 09 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 09 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/03/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 25/11/2013
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF THOSE WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES, DISABILITIES AND OTHER PARTICULAR SPECIAL NEEDS BY THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND THERAPY THROUGH RIDING HORSES AND RELATED ACTIVITIES TO PROMOTE AND DEVELOP THEIR MENTAL AND PHYSICAL CAPABILITIES AND, WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, WITH THE INTENTION THAT THE SKILLS LEARNED AROUND, ON AND WITH HORSES, ARE TRANSFERRED INTO THE UNDERSTANDING OF, AND AN ABILITY IN, SKILLS NECESSARY FOR DAILY LIFE AND WELLBEING.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, DORSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Fortune Centre of Riding Therap
Avon Tyrrell
Bransgore
CHRISTCHURCH
BH23 8EE
- Phone:
- 01425673297
- Email:
- enquiries@fcrt.ac.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window