Accounts and annual returns THE AMOUNDERNESS LIFE LONG LEARNING GROUP U3A

Charity Number: 1045371
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2007 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2006 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2005 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2005 Not submitted
Annual return 31 August 2004 01 February 2006 216 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2004 Not Required