9TH SALE SCOUT GROUP (ST ANNES C OF E)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of Scouting instruction and Activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Trafford
Governance
- 30 March 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Chris Gleaves | Chair | 01 January 2016 |
|
|||||
Joan Tanner | Trustee | 20 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joel Payne | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Pope | Trustee | 18 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Jenny Saxty | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Emma Williams | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Butt | Trustee | 01 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anne STOCKS | Trustee | 23 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Susan PERRIN | Trustee | 23 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Michelle Gilbert | Trustee | 18 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN ANDREW SOLOMON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.40k | £15.93k | £9.71k | £65 | £153 | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.26k | £9.78k | £2.55k | £77 | £9.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 January 2025 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 January 2025 | 444 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 January 2023 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 February 2022 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 March 2021 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 4 JANUARY 1912
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL, INTELLECTUAL, SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIALS AS INDIVIDUALS, AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL, NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 DIXON CLOSE
SALE
M33 3JU
- Phone:
- 07875762463
- Email:
- saledistrictltm@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window