FOSSE BANK SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Fosse Bank School is an independent primary school and kindergarten for girls and boys from age 2 to 11.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2021
Total income:
£1,166,624
Donations and legacies | £600 | |
Charitable activities | £1.09m | |
Other trading activities | £73 | |
Investments | £72.45k | |
Other | £6.88k |
Total expenditure:
£1,159,441
Raising funds | £401 | |
Charitable activities | £1.16m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £401 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.16m | |
Retained for future use | £7.18k |
People

35 Employee(s)
3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kent
Governance
- 30 March 1995: Standard registration
- FOSSE BANK SCHOOL (Working name)
- FOSSE BANK NEW SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MILES SEBASTIAN CAVEY | Chair | 29 June 2005 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE DORIS RICHARDS | Trustee | 30 October 2001 |
|
|
||||
DOUGLAS GEORGE WANSTALL | Trustee | 17 September 1998 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.06m | £1.21m | £1.23m | £1.08m | £1.17m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.00m | £1.16m | £1.28m | £1.12m | £1.16m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £22.86k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £6.93k | £6.24k | £17.41k | £6.89k | £600 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.44k | £1.73k | £1.71k | £2.24k | £73 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £927.19k | £1.08m | £1.10m | £1.02m | £1.09m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £120.25k | £122.77k | £107.23k | £52.67k | £72.45k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £6.88k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.00m | £1.16m | £1.27m | £1.12m | £1.16m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.02k | £1.25k | £1.26k | £661 | £401 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £14.75k | £0 | £0 | £27.36k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £895 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2017 | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £72.19k | £83.57k | £93.72k | £80.09k | £63.00k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £368.87k | £372.27k | £386.49k | £311.38k | £350.60k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £439.43k | £409.95k | £478.08k | £425.99k | £440.18k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | |||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 MAY 1994 AND AMENDED 12 JULY 1994, 1 OCTOBER 1994 AND 30 MAY 2006 AND 11 JUNE 2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17 JUN 2019
Charitable objects
THE CHARITYãS OBJECTS (¶THE OBJECTS÷) ARE TO PROVIDE FOR THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE KENT AND EAST SUSSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
B D O LLP
THAMES TOWER
STATION ROAD
READING
RG1 1LX
- Phone:
- 0118 925 4400
- Email:
- LIZZI.JONES@BDO.CO.UK
- Website:
-
WWW.BDO.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window