BRISTOL VINEYARD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Established for the furtherance of religious or secular public education; advancement of Christian faith including missionary activities in the UK and overseas, including but not limited to planting of new churches and organisations of congregations; relief of the poor and needy; relief of the sick and elderly and other charity objects and for the benefit of other charity bodies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
35 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 04 April 1995: Standard registration
- BRISTOL VINEYARD (Working name)
- Field Vineyard (Working name)
- WEST BRISTOL VINEYARD (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Nelson | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Hope | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Barney Mead | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caleb John Pedersen Mr | Trustee | 01 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
JACQUI CRAWLEY | Trustee | 25 July 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £144.98k | £140.37k | £127.45k | £136.35k | £161.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.25k | £73.05k | £127.49k | £213.92k | £148.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 28 February 2022 | 120 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 28 February 2022 | 120 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/03/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14/09/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/12/2011 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 15/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/05/2012
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION THROUGH THE PLANTING OF OTHER VINEYARD CHURCHES IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF BRISTOL, THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (B) TO FURTHER CHRISTIAN EDUCATION IN SUCH PARTS OF BRISTOL, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT; (C) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING, TRAINING IN LIFE SKILLS AND SUPPORT IN SUCH PARTS OF BRISTOL, THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT; (D) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. (E) TO FURTHER SECULAR PUBLIC EDUCATION IN SUCH PARTS OF BRISTOL, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (F) TO CARRY OUT SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH PARTS OF BRISTOL, THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SEE FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
BRISTOL VINEYARD
419 GLOUCESTER ROAD
HORFIELD
BRISTOL
BS7 8TZ
- Phone:
- 01173731414
- Email:
- karin@bristolvineyard.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window