Accounts and annual returns LANGO ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1045456
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 November 2024 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 February 2024 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 February 2023 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 March 2022 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required