Financial history LANGO ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1045456
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.18k £13.99k £10.87k £15.30k £14.06k
Total expenditure £3.31k £11.27k £8.60k £11.42k £20.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £9.95k N/A N/A N/A