LANGO ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1045456
Charity reporting is up to date (11 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

- Information, advice and support to members and vulnerable communities in the United Kingdom - Advancement of Education for disadvantaged children in the UK - Relief of Poverty - Health Awareness - Cultural Promotion - Youth Peer Support - Emergency Relief

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £14,055
Total expenditure: £20,861

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Religious Activities
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London
  • Uganda

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 March 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Lango Association Trustee 17 April 2019
None on record
Mary Otuko Trustee 03 November 2018
TANZANIA EDUCATION & SKILLS TRUST
Received: On time
Florence Okello-Addai Trustee 03 November 2018
None on record
Florence Adongo Trustee 03 November 2018
None on record
Martin Lanek Trustee 03 November 2018
None on record
James Ameny Trustee 27 July 2015
None on record
Edward Tito Onapa Trustee 25 July 2015
None on record
GEOFFREY ODUR Trustee 03 December 2012
None on record
Geoffrey Odur Trustee 03 December 2012
None on record
MR REAGAN O'DONGO Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £5.18k £13.99k £10.87k £15.30k £14.06k
Total expenditure £3.31k £11.27k £8.60k £11.42k £20.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £9.95k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 11 November 2024 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 09 February 2024 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 February 2023 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 14 March 2022 134 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 May 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
109a Bramshot Avenue
Charlton.
London
SE7 7HX
Phone:
07846240155