Financial history NOTTINGHAM COUNSELLING SERVICE

Charity number: 1045464
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £201.61k £369.60k £388.24k £357.08k £319.79k
Total expenditure £223.15k £253.36k £322.61k £415.75k £356.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £169.31k N/A N/A
Income from government grants £7.00k £28.50k £48.01k £11.17k £21.70k