Financial history THE BARKER-MILL FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1045479
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £59.15k £48.14k £50.85k £60.53k £62.34k
Total expenditure £370.59k £49.36k £113.71k £69.60k £82.78k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A