UDAYAN CULTURAL CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
During the past year, the charity maintained active contacts with the ethnic minority groups & supported them in various ways. As charity itself in financial crisis no such help could be provided to other groups to enhance the potentiality of the youths. Facilities in training in indian arts, music, drama & basic computer provided together with healthcare, cultural & religious festivals.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 14 April 2011
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnsley
- Derbyshire
- Doncaster
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
- Nottinghamshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 31 March 1995: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOY SEN | Trustee | 16 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
BHASKAR BHOWMIK | Trustee | 16 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
RANJAN TALUKDER | Trustee | 16 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
DR PRITIS CHANDRA GHOSH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
AMIYA TALUKDER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DR TUSHAR KANTI MALLIK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DOLLY MALLIK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 14/04/2007 | 14/04/2008 | 14/04/2009 | 14/04/2010 | 14/04/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.86k | £6.94k | £7.14k | £7.17k | £6.98k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.77k | £6.23k | £6.82k | £6.24k | £6.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 14 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 74 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 74 days | |
Annual return | 14 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 440 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 440 days | |
Annual return | 14 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 805 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 April 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 805 days | |
Annual return | 14 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1170 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1170 days | |
Annual return | 14 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1535 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 14 April 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1535 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 MAY 1994 AS AMENDED 4 MARCH 1995
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC (AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO PERSONS OF BENGALI ORIGIN OR DESCENT) IN SHEFFIELD AND THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD AND THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
56 WATSON ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S10 2SD
- Phone:
- 01142685190
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window