NORTH ENGLAND CONFERENCE OF SEVENTH-DAY ADVENTISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A Christian Church involved in promoting the Gospel: active in education & service to the whole community through programmes aimed at youth, family, marriage, health and spiritual development; all seek to encourage good citizenship. A strong emphasis is placed on healthful living to prevent disease. The charity, as a Mission, also assists overseas in humanitarian aid through its related charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£12,357,900
Donations and legacies | £11.96m | |
Charitable activities | £388.19k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £6.53k | |
Other | £4.95k |
Total expenditure:
£10,390,324
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £10.39m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,331,617 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £10.39m | |
Retained for future use | £1.97m |
People

94 Employee(s)
17 Trustee(s)
3130 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England
Governance
- 31 March 1995: Standard registration
- ADVENTIST (Working name)
- ADVENTIST CHURCH (Working name)
- NEC OF SDAS (Working name)
- NECADVENTIST (Working name)
- NORTH ENGLAND CONFERENCE (Working name)
- SDA CHURCH (Working name)
- SEVENTH-DAY ADVENTIST CHURCH (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Steve Palmer | Chair | 12 September 2024 |
|
|||||||
Dr Jeffrey Couzins | Trustee | 10 November 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Amanda Deborah Gardiner | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Alex Opoku-Boateng | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Craig Ramon Gooden | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Patrick Lowe | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Dr Nnenna Madukwe | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Naomi Fuller | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Solon Kyriacou | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Caroline Anne OPIYO-MULLINGS | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Bhekimpilo Nkomo | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Juljan Kastrati | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Sapphira Laurenz Putzgruber | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Snowdon Reid | Trustee | 23 January 2022 |
|
|||||||
Lana Ashby | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Emanuel Bran | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Michael Kwasi Agyei-Asare | Trustee | 09 September 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.68m | £9.60m | £10.20m | £11.54m | £12.36m | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.93m | £9.99m | £8.68m | £9.58m | £10.39m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.46m | £1.15m | £1.17m | £1.33m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £9.86m | £9.42m | £9.92m | £11.23m | £11.96m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £428.24k | £174.90k | £269.65k | £309.43k | £388.19k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £11.70k | £5.59k | £2.25k | £5.22k | £6.53k | |
|
Income - Other | £378.46k | £0 | £2.32k | £0 | £4.95k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £4.39k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £86.86k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £9.93m | £9.99m | £8.68m | £9.58m | £10.39m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £36.26k | £127.10k | £164.23k | £59.25k | £63.33k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £2.35m | £2.35m | £3.22m | £3.66m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £7.51m | £7.56m | £7.39m | £7.17m | £7.18m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £2.15m | £2.36m | £3.33m | £5.23m | £7.20m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.15m | £1.79m | £1.07m | £784.37k | £794.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/02/1995 AS AMENDED ON 15/09/1996 AS AMENDED ON 04/11/1999 AS AMENDED ON 20/06/2004 AS AMENDED ON 29/06/2008 AS AMENDED ON 14/09/2012 as amended on 12 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROCLAIM AND TEACH THE EVERLASTING GOSPEL OF OUR LORD AND SAVIOUR JESUS CHRIST IN HARMONY WITH THE PURPOSE AND POLICY OF THE BRITISH UNION CONFERENCE OF SEVENTH-DAY ADVENTISTS.
Area of benefit
THE TERRITORY OF THIS CONFERENCE SHALL CONSIST OF THE ISLE OF MAN AND THE ENGLISH COUNTIES NORTH OF AND INCLUDING NORTHAMPTONSHIRE, WARWICKSHIRE AND WORCESTER.
Contact information
- Address:
-
C/O NORTH ENGLAND CONFERENCE
22 ZULLA ROAD
MAPPERLEY PARK
NOTTINGHAM
NG3 5DB
- Phone:
- 01159606312
- Email:
- admin@necadventist.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window