RICHMOND YMCA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supported housing for young people in Richmond. Youth Work. Skatepark.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 31 March 1995: Standard registration
- 18 February 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £234.21k | £176.37k | £113.56k | £51.14k | £22.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £248.40k | £187.56k | £254.34k | £104.77k | £99.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £50.50k | £33.38k | £9.93k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £142.09k | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 03 July 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 20 December 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 20 December 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 MARCH 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 15 JAN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04 JUN 2018
Charitable objects
1.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARISE FROM ITS ACCEPTANCE OF ITS FOUNDING CHRISTIAN PRINCIPLE, THE PARIS BASIS OF 1855 INCORPORATED INTO THE NATIONAL STATEMENT OF THE AIMS AND PURPOSES OF THE YMCA IN ENGLAND AS IT MAY BE AMENDED FROM TIME TO TIME. 1.1.1 CONSEQUENTLY THE ASSOCIATION IS PART OF THE WORLDWIDE YMCA, A CHRISTIAN MOVEMENT WHICH SEEKS TO UNITE THOSE WHO, REGARDING JESUS CHRIST AS THEIR GOD AND SAVIOUR ACCORDING TO THE HOLY SCRIPTURES, DESIRE TO BE HIS DISCIPLES IN THEIR FAITH AND IN THEIR LIFE, AND TO ASSOCIATE THEIR EFFORTS FOR THE EXTENSION OF HIS KINGDOM. ANY DIFFERENCE OF OPINION ON ANY OTHER MATTER SHALL NOT INTERFERE WITH THE HARMONIOUS RELATIONS OF THE YMCA MOVEMENT. 1.2 THE ASSOCIATION WELCOMES, SERVES AND WORKS WITH PERSONS OF ALL RELIGIOUS FAITHS AND OF NONE. 1.3 ACCORDINGLY THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE: 1.3.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH, INCLUDING BY: (A) PROMOTING A CHRISTIAN ENVIRONMENT INSPIRED AND MOTIVATED BY THE LIFE, EXAMPLE AND TEACHING OF JESUS CHRIST, WHERE PEOPLE OF FAITH AND PEOPLE OF NONE CAN WORK TOGETHER FOR THE TRANSFORMATION OF COMMUNITIES; AND (B) ENABLING PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AND IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE, TO FLOURISH THROUGH EXPERIENCING AND RESPONDING TO THE LOVE OF GOD DEMONSTRATED BY THE LIFE, EXAMPLE AND TEACHING OF JESUS CHRIST; 1.3.2 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION FOR MEN AND WOMEN WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; 1.3.3 TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION FOR PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AND IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE, WITH THE OBJECT OF DEVELOPING THEIR PHYSICAL, MENTAL OR SPIRITUAL CAPACITIES; 1.3.4 TO RELIEVE OR ASSIST IN THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AND IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE, WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL, PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL, SPIRITUAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES; AND 1.3.5 TO PROVIDE RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION, FOR PEOPLE OF ALL AGES AND IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE, WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL, PHYSICAL, EMOTIONAL, SPIRITUAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window