Accounts and annual returns BEES AND TREES LIMITED

Charity number: 1045505
Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 May 2023 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 May 2022 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 May 2022 470 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required