BEES AND TREES LIMITED

Charity number: 1045505
Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

environment / conservation / heritage

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Shropshire
  • Staffordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 31 March 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
SARAH JANE DOUGLAS Trustee
None on record
PENNY JILL MCCARTHY Trustee
None on record
NORMAN JOHN STANIER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £6.03k £6.06k £7.37k £1.69k £0
Total expenditure £10.04k £5.04k £10.32k £5.32k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 96 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 462 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 May 2023 100 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 May 2022 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 May 2022 470 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
WHITTON COTTAGE
WHITTON
LEINTWARDINE
CRAVEN ARMS
SY7 0LS
Phone:
01547540374
Website:

No information available