Accounts and annual returns MILLERS DENE FAMILY CENTRE

Charity number: 1045546
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2011 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 14 December 2011 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2010 03 December 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 27 January 2011 On Time