Financial history SOMERSET AND DORSET RAILWAY HERITAGE TRUST

Charity number: 1045547
Charity reporting is up to date (3 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £345.67k £106.76k £114.42k £105.75k £126.66k
Total expenditure £139.43k £81.18k £75.14k £85.88k £51.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A