WELLS FESTIVAL OF LITERATURE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In line with its educational objectives, the company organises the annual Wells Festival of Literature at which leading writers give inspirational, challenging lectures to audiences of all ages and tastes. The Company also funds workshops for young people to interact with inspirational authors. The company is also instrumental in promoting Beanstalk, a national literacy project, in the South West.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- 06 April 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Denley John Manning | Chair | 11 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dorothy Wright | Trustee | 23 February 2018 |
|
|||||
Sian Elizabeth Decamp | Trustee | 23 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Frances Mary Rowe | Trustee | 23 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alex Kolombos | Trustee | 20 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hilary Thomasine Cain | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.91k | £57.81k | £77.16k | £93.18k | £92.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £82.97k | £71.15k | £79.82k | £82.84k | £89.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 02 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 13 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 JUNE 1993
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE ARTS GENERALLY AND ADVANCE EDUCATION BY MEANS OF FESTIVALS OF THE ARTS AND ENTERTAINMENTS IN THE CITY OF WELLS AND ELSEWHERE IN SUCH MANNER, AT SUCH TIMES, IN SUCH PLACES AND SO OFTEN AS THE BOARD OF THE COMPANY SHALL THINK FIT AND DO ALL SUCH THINGS AS ARE INCIDENTAL OR NECESSARY TO THE ATTAINMENT OF SUCH OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE, THE CITY OF WELLS
Contact information
- Address:
-
TREGANTLE
MILTON LANE
WELLS
SOMERSET
BA5 2QT
- Phone:
- 01749673525
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window