Financial history BICKERTON PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1045675
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £2.56k £1.96k £2.41k £535 £1.00k
Total expenditure £557 £523 £3.72k £4.51k £1.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A