Accounts and annual returns PONSANOOTH PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1045695
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 March 2025 45 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 17 March 2025 45 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 18 March 2024 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 18 March 2024 47 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 March 2023 55 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 March 2023 55 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 17 August 2022 198 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 17 August 2022 198 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 April 2021 60 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 01 April 2021 60 days late Download Open in new window