Financial history PONSANOOTH PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP

Charity number: 1045695
Charity reporting is up to date (45 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £88.02k £89.66k £91.16k £97.58k £120.80k
Total expenditure £109.25k £85.91k £95.07k £103.65k £108.01k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £52.11k £73.82k £57.72k £56.32k £60.49k