GEDNEY HILL V C P SCHOOL FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Lincolnshire
Governance
- 10 April 1995: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 JANUARY 1995
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS OF GEDNEY HILL V C P SCHOOL BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EDUCATIONAL,RECREATIONAL AND OTHER CHARITABLE FACILITIES IN AUGMENTATION OF SUCH FACILITIES FINANCED BY THE L.E.A.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window