Financial history THE DALES SPECIAL SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1045711
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 02/01/2020 02/01/2021 02/01/2022 02/01/2023 02/01/2024
Total gross income £42.04k £21.57k £17.14k £50.25k £32.09k
Total expenditure £65.23k £5.07k £13.50k £33.09k £25.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £5.10k £500 £5.00k