JESSIE'S FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Jessie's Fund helps seriously ill children, and those with complex needs or special educational needs and disabilities, to communicate by using creative music-making and music therapy. Jessie's Fund works with children all over the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 April 1995: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
NANCY MAGUIRE | Chair | 29 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Julia Caroline Rochester | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Emma Lincoln | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jack Aaron Zaborski | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Rose Villiers | Trustee | 16 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elisabeth Varlow | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW GRACE | Trustee | 02 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Dr ALAN GEORGE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEVEN BURKEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Dr HANNAH REBECCA GEORGE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £290.75k | £252.20k | £300.52k | £252.96k | £296.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £320.71k | £252.02k | £253.21k | £310.70k | £310.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 21 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25/03/1995 AS AMENDED ON 15/02/2013 as amended on 30 Jun 2021 as amended on 30 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE COMPLEX MEDICAL NEEDS, TERMINAL ILLNESS, OR SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS THROUGH THE THERAPEUTIC USE OF MUSIC
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 PRIORY STREET
YORK
YO1 6ET
- Phone:
- 01904658189
- Email:
- info@jessiesfund.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window