Accounts and annual returns PROSPECT EDUCATION TRUST

Charity number: 1045736
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 28 October 2019 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 October 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 20 October 2018 On Time