DARTS (DARTFORD AID FOR RESEARCH AND TRAINING IN SURGERY)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Surgical Research and Training
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Kent
Governance
- 12 April 1995: Standard registration
- 09 September 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 28 September 2010: Standard registration
- 09 October 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- DARTS (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Investment
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3 | £462 | £68 | £3 | £2 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £459 | £360 | £360 | £270 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 13 August 2019 | 194 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 31 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 4TH NOVEMBER 1994
Charitable objects
1.THE RELIEF OF PATIENTS SUFFERING FROM CANCER AND ALL OTHER DISEASES 2.THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF RECREATIONAL AND OTHER FACILITIES AND BENEFITS FOR SUCH PATIENTS 3.THE RELIEF IN CASES OF FINANCIAL DISTRESS OF THE DEPENDENTS OF SUCH PATIENTS OR OF DECEASED PATIENTS 4.THE PROVISION OF RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES AND TREATMENT OF CANCER AND ALL OTHER DISEASES 5.THE TREATMENT AND TRAINING FOR THE TREATMENT OF CANCER AND ALL OTHER DISEASES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window