FLORE MILLENNIUM HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A village hall used for various hirers within and outwith the village of Flore. Typical regular hirers include Indoor Bowling, Martial Arts, Drama group and visiting theatre companies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Northamptonshire
Governance
- 11 April 1995: Standard registration
- FLORE VILLAGE HALL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ERIC INGRAM | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Keith Douglas Anderson | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
John Miller | Trustee | 01 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Morris Freeman | Trustee | 18 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
LIZ NYE | Trustee | 17 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANE ROWE | Trustee | 14 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
GAVIN ROWE | Trustee | 23 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET ANN CLARKE B A | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.47k | £29.00k | £15.05k | £15.35k | £17.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.94k | £8.95k | £12.91k | £14.50k | £10.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £27.43k | £2.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 16 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 01 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1160 days | |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 20TH JANUARY 1995
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF: (A)THE FLORE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE AND (B)THE INHABITANTS OF FLORE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
FLORE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF
Contact information
- Address:
-
1a KINGS LANE
FLORE
NORTHAMPTON
NN7 4LQ
- Phone:
- 01327349103
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window