Financial history BRITISH ASSOCIATION FOR PSYCHOLOGICAL TYPE

Charity number: 1045772
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £27.38k £11.04k £15.06k £15.29k £14.77k
Total expenditure £23.35k £6.17k £9.84k £15.11k £13.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A