Accounts and annual returns NORTH WEST COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1045777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 11 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 11 August 2024 164 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 11 August 2024 530 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 11 May 2022 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 24 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required