NORTH WEST COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1045777
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Community Centre for North-West Fareham.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £9,357
Total expenditure: £20,144

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Hampshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 April 1995: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Timothy Vincent Chair Chair 05 July 2016
None on record
Jessica Nossum Vice-chair Trustee 08 July 2019
None on record
Daena Vincent Treasurer Trustee 05 July 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £9.94k £23.12k £16.04k £7.11k £9.36k
Total expenditure £5.28k £6.73k £6.41k £17.16k £20.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £19.91k £10.67k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 11 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 11 August 2024 164 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 11 August 2024 530 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 11 May 2022 72 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 24 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
114 Hillson Drive
FAREHAM
PO15 6PD
Phone:
07774249702
Website:

farehamnwca.org.uk