Financial history Markbeech Village Hall

Charity Number: 1045794
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.53k £24.08k £18.63k £35.04k £14.07k
Total expenditure £3.73k £3.54k £11.34k £61.82k £10.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £21.05k £10.67k £2.00k N/A