STEPPING STONES FAMILY SUPPORT PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Family support for parents and carers of children Local womens group with creche support Education around parenting and childcare
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
Governance
- 12 April 1995: Standard registration
- 14 September 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- STEPPING STONES (Working name)
- THE GILGAL PROJECT (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.72k | £12.19k | £18.32k | £5.97k | £1.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.15k | £16.22k | £12.78k | £7.27k | £8.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 31 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 18 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 04 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 4 JULY 1991 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 MARCH 1995, 25 NOVEMBER 2004 AND 20 SEPTEMBER 2007.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE COMPANY IS TO PURSUE ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CITY OF BIRMINGHAM AND ELSEWHERE: I) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM SICKNESS, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY CHILDREN, YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES; II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT BY ANY OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT; III) TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN CHILD CARE AND OTHER ASSOCIATED SUBJECTS PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COURSES, CLASSES AND BY ANY OTHER CHARITABLE MEANS THAT THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME SEE FIT; IV) TO PURSUE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE WHICH THE TRUSTEES SEE FIT FOR PURSUIT, IN CONJUNCTION WITH ANY OF THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES ALREADY LISTED.
Area of benefit
BIRMINGHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window