POPPIT SANDS SURF LIFESAVING CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The training and develepment of young people from the ages of 5 to 18 to be able to swim in the sea and the use of various equipment,e.g. skis, etc. To take part in inter club competitions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £18,000 from 3 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 19 April 1995: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 July 2010: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eirian Ruth Purnell | Trustee | 11 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Christopher John Purnell | Trustee | 11 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Barrie Forster | Trustee | 10 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lynda Forster | Trustee | 10 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.41k | £3.22k | £25.27k | £35.91k | £50.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.85k | £4.08k | £26.67k | £24.88k | £50.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | N/A | £2.83k | £7.91k | £18.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 February 2025 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 15 February 2025 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 February 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 February 2023 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 April 2022 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 5 APRIL 1994
Charitable objects
A)THE PREVENTION AND REDUCTION OF LOSS OF LIFE BY DROWNING ON POPPIT SANDS. B) THE PROMOTION OF THE METHODS OF SURF LIFESAVING FOR THE RESUSCITATION OF THE RESCUED AND THE APPLICATION OF FIRST AID.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Parc Y Rhofft
Gwbert
CARDIGAN
Dyfed
SA43 1PR
- Phone:
- 07467949960
- Email:
- poppitslsc@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window