WALES COUNCIL OF THE BLIND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WCB is the umbrella agency in Wales representing blind and partially sighted people and the clubs and societies that support them. We gather the opinions and views of people with sight loss through groups and consultation. We put their voice at the centre of what we do, reporting their views to the people who are responsible for the services that help them. We signpost people to these services.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £106,485 from 2 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout Wales
Governance
- 18 April 1995: Standard registration
- 24 July 2012: Funds received from 525768 THE CAMBRIAN EDUCATIONAL TRUST FUND
- SOUTHERNDOWN CARE HOME (Working name)
- VISION IN WALES (Previous name)
- WALES COUNCIL FOR THE BLIND - CYNGOR CYMREIG Y DEILLION (Previous name)
- WALES COUNCIL FOR THE BLIND - CYNGOR CYMRU I'R DEILLION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANICE D POWERS | Chair | 21 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
Helen Simon | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm John Nicholas | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Michelle Wall | Trustee | 06 November 2023 |
|
|||||
Rhianwen Elen Stiff | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian James Hobart | Trustee | 18 August 2015 |
|
|||||
JULIE THOMAS | Trustee | 24 July 2013 |
|
|||||
BRIAN MAWBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER CURTIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186.59k | £160.81k | £120.07k | £128.78k | £137.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £212.58k | £147.03k | £149.47k | £149.61k | £157.21k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £139.16k | £33.02k | £106.44k | £106.53k | £106.49k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 February 2021 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/01/1991 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/02/1999 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 30/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/07/2014
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF BLIND AND PARTIALLY SIGHTED PERSONS, AND THE PREVENTION OF BLINDNESS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE WALES
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wales Council Of The Blind
Hastings House
Fitzalan Place
CARDIFF
CF24 0BL
- Phone:
- 02920473954
- Email:
- owen@wcb-ccd.org.uk
- Website:
-
wcb-ccd.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window