COLCHESTER HAS ACTIVE PROSTATE SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of awareness in mens health and urology
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Essex
Governance
- 18 April 1995: Standard registration
- CHAPS (Working name)
- UROLOGY RESEARCH IN NORTH ESSEX (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stephen Patrick Green | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
John Henry Schultz | Trustee | 14 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER BOOTH FRCS, | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARK PASSMORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARIE TAYLOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £84.21k | £16.02k | £63.95k | £97.32k | £116.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.79k | £36.93k | £52.27k | £67.10k | £107.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | Download Open in new window | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28TH FEBRUARY 1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 25 NOVEMBER 2008.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED IS THE PROMOTION OF MEN'S HEALTHCARE AND THE RELIEF OF RELATED SICKNESS AND DISTRESS IN MEN SUFFERING FROM DISEASES, INCLUDING CANCER, OF THE PROSTATE GLAND AND OTHER UROLOGICAL DISORDERS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN UROLOGICAL MATTERS IN PARTICULAR BY: (I) RAISING PUBLIC AWARENESS AND PROVIDING INFORMATION ABOUT PROSTATE DISEASES WITH A VIEW TO ENCOURAGING EARLY TREATMENT OF PROSTATE AND UROLOGICAL DISORDERS; (II) THE PURCHASE AND USE OF SPECIALIST AND OTHER MEDICAL EQUIPMENT FOR USE IN THE DETECTION, DIAGNOSIS AND TREATMENT OF UROLOGICAL DISORDERS' (III) ANALYSING THE CASE HISTORIES WITH A VIEW TO DISCOVERING ANY USEFUL INFORMATION OR MATERIAL WHICH MAY LEAD THE POSSIBLE PREVENTION OR CURE OF UROLOGICAL DISORDERS INCLUDING CONDUCTING OR COMMISSIONING ANY RELEVANT RESEARCH AND PUBLISHING THE USEFUL RESULTS THEREOF; (IV) ACTING AS CONSULTANTS AND ADVISERS TO MEDICAL ESTABLISHMENTS, AND OTHER APPROPRIATE ORGANISATIONS, TO ENCOURAGE THE ADVANCEMENT OF MEDICAL RESEARCH AND UNDERSTANDING; (V) UNDERTAKING THE TESTING AND DEVELOPMENT OF MEDICINES AND DRUGS OF ALL KINDS AND MEDICAL TECHNIQUES AND CORPORATION OPERATIONS; AND (VI) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR UROLOGICAL EDUCATION OF MEDICAL STAFF AND THE PUBLIC IN NORTH EAST ESSEX AND THE BETTER AWARENESS OF THE PUBLIC AND PATIENTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Passmore Weeks & Richardson
Unit 2
Beacon End Courtyard
London Road
Stanway
COLCHEST
- Phone:
- 01206 578500
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window