THE WALKLEY COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Walkley Community Centre provides facilities for hire for use by local people for recreation, education and social activities. In addition in provides a snooker hall for use by local people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 May 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 19 April 1995: Standard registration
- 16 December 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 16 December 2011: Funds transferred to 1136976 WALKLEY COMMUNITY CENTRE
- FIR STREET (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 03/05/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.52k | £22.90k | £15.98k | £50.41k | £25.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.07k | £13.74k | £24.31k | £52.08k | £34.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 03 May 2011 | 29 November 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 May 2011 | 29 November 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 13 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 13 January 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 03 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 03 January 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 20 January 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 20 January 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 NOVEMBER 1980 AS AMENDED 13 MAY 1984 AND 8 DECEMBER 1994 AND 23 MARCH 1995
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE AVAILABILITY OF EDUCATION AND IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE QUALITY OF LIFE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE WALKLEY AREA BY ASSOCIATING WITH THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS (B) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE
Area of benefit
WALKLEY, SHEFFIELD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window