Accounts and annual returns NIELDS PRIMARY AND NUSERY SCHOOL PARENTS TEACHERS AND FRIENDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1045883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 17 June 2024 17 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 07 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 04 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 28 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 30 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required